judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00160-CV
07-94-00160-CV
04/08/1994
Contract
McClain, Hazel Gibson and Carolyn McClain
Four Bears Corp., Robert S. Folsom and Folsom Investments, Inc.
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/23/1996Mandate Issued
02/01/1996Case Returned from Higher Court
10/05/1995Case Forwarded to Higher Court
09/25/1995Writ of Habeas Corpus, Prohibition, Etc.
09/13/1995Motion to Modify Order/JudgmentOverruled
09/01/1995Motion to Modify Order/Judgment
08/23/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/11/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/25/1995Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
03/02/1995Submitted
03/02/1995Submission
02/03/1995Submission
06/14/1994Brief Filed
06/14/1994Case ready to be set
05/18/1994Brief Filed
04/14/1994Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/23/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Four Bears Corp., Robert S. FoAppelleeJoseph W. Geary
G. Leroy Street
McClain, Hazel Gibson And CaroAppellantBilly R. McGill
Robert F. Henderson
Trial Court Information
44th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Candace G. Tyson
92-13092-B