judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00159-CR
07-94-00159-CR
04/08/1994
All Misdemeanors
Bruno, Rogelio Antonio
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/24/1996Mandate Issued
05/07/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/01/1995Submitted
12/01/1995Submission
10/18/1995Submission
01/27/1995Brief Filed
01/27/1995Case ready to be set
12/20/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
12/19/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/21/1994Brief Filed
11/21/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
09/20/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
09/19/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/24/1994Do not use
06/24/1994Do not use
06/24/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
05/23/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/17/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/24/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Vance
Bruno, Rogelio AntonioCriminal - AppellantMichelle Phillips Scheef
Robert P. Abbott
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No 9
Dallas
Honorable Molly M. Francis
MA93-45726-K
90 da/12 mo prob $600 fine