judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00110-CV
07-94-00110-CV
04/08/1994
Contract
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Kendrick, Kenneth L.
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/23/1995Mandate Issued
04/04/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/02/1995Submitted
03/02/1995Submission
02/03/1995Submission
05/05/1994Brief Filed
05/05/1994Case ready to be set
05/03/1994Do not use
04/19/1994Motion to Supplement the Record DisposedGRANT
04/11/1994Brief Filed
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/30/1994Motion to Supplement the Record Filed
03/11/1994Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/23/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Federal Deposit Insurance CorpAppellantJohn C. Hampton
Kendrick, Kenneth L.AppelleeLawrence R., Jr. Maxwell
Trial Court Information
14th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Samuel C. Kiser
91-13911-A