judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00131-CV
07-94-00131-CV
04/08/1994
Other Personal Injury
Reed, Teresa
Peoplecare, Heritage Gardens, d/b/a Heritage Gardens
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/13/1994Mandate Issued
08/23/1994Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
08/23/1994Submitted
08/23/1994Submission
05/24/1994Supplemental Brief Filed
05/20/1994Brief Filed
05/20/1994Case ready to be set
05/16/1994Brief Filed
05/04/1994Mot for Ext Transcript DispGRANT
04/22/1994Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
04/11/1994Do not use
04/11/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/13/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Reed, TeresaAppellantBrenda J. Williams
Peoplecare, Heritage GardensAppelleeThomas F. Harkins, Jr.
Trial Court Information
191st District Court
Dallas
Honorable Abe Lopez
93-10028-J