judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00138-CV
07-94-00138-CV
04/08/1994
Other Personal Injury
Bell, Savannah
Showa Denko K.K., et al
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/01/1995Mandate Issued
11/14/1995Case Returned from Higher Court
07/26/1995Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/24/1995Writ of Habeas Corpus, Prohibition, Etc.
06/23/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/19/1995Mot. for extension of time to file Rehearing DispGRANT
06/19/1995Response to any order, inquiry or motion
06/06/1995Mot. for extension of time to file rehearing filed
06/02/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/17/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/20/1995Letter Brief Filed
03/29/1995Letter Brief Filed
03/09/1995Letter Brief Filed
03/03/1995Submitted
03/03/1995Submission
03/01/1995Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous)GRANT
02/24/1995Supplemental Brief Filed
02/22/1995Motion Requesting Oral Argument DisposedGRANT
02/08/1995Motion Requesting Oral Argument Filed
02/03/1995Submission
09/09/1994Brief Filed
09/09/1994Case ready to be set
08/09/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
07/25/1994Brief Filed
07/25/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/28/1994Brief Filed
06/06/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
05/24/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/15/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
04/14/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/21/1994Do not use
03/15/1994Do not use
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/01/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Whole Foods Market, Inc.AppelleeSusan L. Moore
Showa Denko K.k.AppelleeBryan J. Maedgen
Rowland Foster
Bell, SavannahAppellantKathleen Rolston Robbins
Denko, ShowaAppelleeJames K., Iii Peden
Trial Court Information
193rd District Court
Dallas
Honorable Michael Schwille
92-11309-L