judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01131-CV
05-89-01131-CV
09/19/1989
Other Personal Injury
Mason, Juanita M.
Georgia-Pacific Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
11/06/1997Record RetentionDestroy
06/08/1990Mandate Issued
06/08/1990Mandate Issued
04/17/1990Submission
04/16/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
04/16/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
04/13/1990Motion for Dismissal Filed
03/06/1990Letter Sent by the Court
03/05/1990Letter Filed
02/23/1990MattConv
02/21/1990Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/16/1990Response to Motion
02/12/1990Motion to Withdraw Attorney
01/09/1990Supplemental Transcript filed
12/29/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/28/1989Response to Motion
12/15/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans
11/22/1989Case ready to be set
11/22/1989Brief Filed
11/22/1989Case ready to be set
10/30/1989Brief Filed
10/25/1989Letter Sent by the Court
10/25/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/25/1989Motion to Consolidate DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/09/1989MattConv
10/09/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/09/1989Motion to Consolidate Filed
09/19/1989Transcript Filed
09/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/08/1989Appeal Bond Filed
08/09/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
88-9327-A