judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9077
C-9077
09/20/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
JOE A. GAMEZ
THE FOURTH COURT OF APPEALS ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/20/1990Brief receivedRelatorCOPY OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERT
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/09/1990U.S. Supreme Court noticeWrit of Cert, Denied 10-01-90, No. 89-2002
06/28/1990U.S. Supreme Court noticeWRIT OF CERT FILED
03/20/1990Brief receivedCOPY OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERT
02/26/1990U.S. Supreme Court noticeEXTEND TIME F/FILING OF WRIT OF CERT TO MARCH 17, 1990.
01/25/1990Letter ReceivedFROM US SUPREME COURT
11/09/1989Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED
10/18/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
10/18/1989Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.OverruledM/L/F MO FOR EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF
10/18/1989Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.OverruledREQUEST FOR ANCILLARY RELIEF
10/18/1989Motion to Consolidate disposedOverruled`
10/09/1989Notice of change of counselLETTER FROM ASST. ATTY GEN., JUDY PONDER, STATING THAT SHE WILL BE COUNSEL OF RECORD
10/02/1989Miscellaneous MotionM/L/F EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF
10/02/1989Motion to Consolidate filedWITH C-9076 & C-8509
10/02/1989Transcript received
09/20/1989Miscellaneous MotionREQUEST FOR ANCILLARY RELIEF
09/20/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
09/20/1989No description available.
09/20/1989Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/09/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE BAR GRIEVANCE, 10-ARespondentMr. John M. Pinckney III
CLAWSON, JAMES A.RespondentMr. John M. Pinckney III
Court of Appeals Information:
04-88-00587-CV
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
57th District Court
Bexar
Honorable J. F. Clawson
86-CI-07087