judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1277-89
PD-1277-89
09/20/1989
PDR Case Type
MOSS, ROBERT STEPHEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/24/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/20/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Moss, Robert StephenApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Robert Stephen Moss
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
13-88-00391-CR
Aff 6-29-89
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
Honorable MICHAEL T. MCSPADDEN
481732