judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9073
C-9073
09/20/1989
App Writ of Error
JUNE T. WRIGHT INDIVIDUALLY AND a/n/f OF HER MINOR
CARDOX CORPORATION LIQUID AIR CORPORATION AND WENDELL BAZAR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/09/1990Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondent
02/27/1990Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondent
02/15/1990Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/10/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentON BEHALF OF CARDOX
10/05/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentON BEHALF OF WENDELL BAZAR, 2 MORE COPIES ON THE WAY, RECEIVED 2 COPIES ON 10-06-89
09/20/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/09/1990list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksREPLY TO MO RE; ONLY 2 AVAILABLE
03/09/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsREHEARING OVERRULED
03/09/1990Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed
03/07/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledREHEARING OVERRULED
03/07/1990Notice requesting filing fee
02/27/1990Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed
02/22/1990Motion for Rehearing forwardedRECORD REMAINS IN THE CLERK'S OFFICE
02/15/1990Motion for Rehearing
01/31/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
10/12/1989Case forwarded to Court
10/12/1989No description available.
10/10/1989Reply to ResponseON BEHALF OF CARDOX
10/05/1989Reply to ResponseON BEHALF OF WENDELL BAZAR, 2 MORE COPIES ON THE WAY, RECEIVED 2 COPIES ON 10-06-89
09/20/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
03/09/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
R.W. (MINOR)PetitionerMr. Gus Zgourides
C.S.W. (MINOR)PetitionerMr. Gus Zgourides
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
___ SW2d ___, 07-13-89
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable ROSS A. SEARS
Trial Court Information
334th District Court
Harris
Honorable Marsha Anthony
83-64527