judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00746-CV
14-89-00746-CV
08/09/1989
Miscellaneous civil
In The Matter of Burns, Chad, A Juvenile
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/13/1990Case stored
06/11/1990Mandate Issued
06/11/1990Mandate Issued
05/11/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
04/26/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/26/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/18/1990Submitted
04/18/1990Submission
04/18/1990Submitted
03/21/1990Submission
11/06/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/06/1989Case ready to be set
11/06/1989Case ready to be set
10/12/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/12/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/02/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/01/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
08/18/1989Transcript FILED
08/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/27/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
07/06/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeJohn R. Jones
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantLarry Urquhart
Trial Court Information
21st District Court
Washington
281