judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-89-00195-CR
10-89-00195-CR
08/08/1989
Assault
Thomas Douglas Barnhill
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/27/2016Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
05/22/1991Case stored
05/22/1991Mandate issued by this Court
02/28/1991No Description Available.
02/28/1991No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/24/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/04/1990No Description Available.
11/01/1990Submitted
11/01/1990Submission
06/22/1990No Description Available.
06/22/1990Submission
05/29/1990No Description Available.
05/24/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/24/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/22/1990No Description Available.
05/22/1990No Description Available.
03/22/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/22/1990No Description Available.
03/06/1990No Description Available.
02/26/1990No Description Available.
12/21/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/19/1989No Description Available.
11/29/1989No Description Available.
10/19/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/17/1989No Description Available.
08/21/1989No Description Available.
08/10/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/07/1989No Description Available.
08/03/1989No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/27/2016Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Barnhill, Thomas DouglasAppellantJames H. Kreimeyer Jr.
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasHon. Phillip H. Zeigler
Trial Court Information
52nd District Court
Coryell
Honorable Bobby Louis Cummings
11,553
18 years T.D.C.