judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6839
B-6839
06/15/1977
Application for Writ of Error
COASTAL INDUSTRIAL WATER AUTHORITY
TRINITY PORTLAND CEMENT DIVISION, GENERAL PORTLAND CEMENT CO.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/24/1978Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/06/1978Letter brief Respondent
09/01/1977Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
06/27/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
06/15/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/24/1978Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/15/1978Opinion issued
02/06/1978Letter brief
12/07/1977Document received (See Remarks)
12/07/1977Document received (See Remarks)
09/01/1977Supplement to Petition filed
06/27/1977Response to Petition
06/15/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/15/1977Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Trinity Portland Cement Division, General Portland Cement Co.Respondent
Coastal Industrial Water AuthorityPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information