judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-97-00026-CR
02-97-00026-CR
01/13/1997
Robbery
Lamb, Rodney K.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/06/1998Mandate Issued
01/14/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
10/29/1997Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
10/02/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/02/1997Submitted
09/02/1997Submission
05/19/1997Brief Filed
05/19/1997Case ready to be set
03/27/1997Submission
03/18/1997Brief Filed
03/12/1997No Description Available.
02/25/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/14/1997Response Filed
01/31/1997Motion Filed
01/17/1997No Description Available.
01/13/1997No Description Available.
01/13/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/06/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasTim Curry
Lamb, Rodney K.Criminal - AppellantPete Gilfeather
Trial Court Information
371st District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Virgil Vahlenkamp
0541945A
Ct1: 20 yrs IDTDCJ