judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 97-0048
97-0048
01/16/1997
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
DANNY HERMAN TRUCKING INC.
THE HONORABLE GUADALUPE RIVERA JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/15/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/14/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/13/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/15/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/14/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/13/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/07/1997Case Stored
01/16/1997Motion to Stay DisposedOverruled
01/16/1997Motion to Stay Filed
01/16/1997Exhibits receivedO + 2 copies
01/16/1997M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
01/16/1997Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
01/16/1997Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/07/1997Case StoredCase stored.1G5
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
TEXAS DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATIONOther interested party Ms. Bonnie C. Lockhart
Ms. Bonnie C. Lockhart
CAPSHAW, JR., CHRISTOPHER R.RespondentMr. R. Wayne Pritchard
CAPSHAW, CHRISTOPHER R.RespondentMr. R. Wayne Pritchard
CITY OF EL PASOOther interested party Ms. Chris Marie Borunda
CAPSHAW, JONATHAN DAVIDRespondentMr. R. Wayne Pritchard
RIVERA, GUADALUPE JudgeHonorable Guadalupe Rivera
DANNY HERMAN TRUCKING, INC.RelatorMr. Arthur K. Smith
Mr. Michael L. Cohen
Court of Appeals Information:
08-97-00019-CV
Denied
RULE 90, 01-15-97
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
168th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Guadalupe Rivera
95-2326