judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 11-97-00009-CV
11-97-00009-CV
01/14/1997
Miscellaneous civil
Martinez, Marjorie, Individually and on behalf of the estate of David Clish, Deceased
Abilene, The City of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/10/2005Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/31/1998Yearly opinion book
04/23/1998Mandate issued
02/05/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/24/1997Additonal Authorities
09/18/1997Submitted
09/18/1997Submission set in Eastland
08/18/1997Submission set in Eastland
05/01/1997Miscellaneous motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/23/1997Miscellaneous motion filed
04/23/1997Brief filed
04/23/1997Case ready to be set
03/20/1997Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/05/1997Mot. - Ext. to file brief
02/17/1997Brief filed
01/17/1997Filing fee paid
01/17/1997Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed
01/14/1997TR received
01/14/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/23/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Martinez, MarjorieAppellantRoy B. Longacre
Abilene, The City OfAppelleeKatie Anderson
Victor G. Carrillo
Sharon Hicks
David J. Labrec
Trial Court Information
42nd District Court
Taylor
Honorable John Weeks, Judge
43,883-A