judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-97-00024-CR
13-97-00024-CR
01/14/1997
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Perez, Eric Aldo
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/2009Case stored
05/23/2008Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/21/2008Motion filed
05/12/2008Motion filed
02/22/2007Letter filed
10/07/1999Letter sent
09/01/1999Letter sent
07/12/1999Document Received
06/11/1999Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk
06/03/1999Mandate Issued
05/04/1999Record returned
04/07/1999Higher Court DecisionDismissed
04/07/1999Higher Court DecisionRefused
03/17/1999Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct.
03/15/1999Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
03/15/1999Court of Crim. Appeals Number
03/08/1999Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct.
02/23/1999Copy of Letter
02/18/1999Copy of Letter
02/08/1999Petition for Review - CR -
01/28/1999XPetition for Discretionary Review
11/23/1998Motion for Extension of Time DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/19/1998XPetition for Discretionary Review
10/29/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/26/1998Letter sent
09/02/1998Submitted
09/02/1998Submission
08/12/1998Submission
07/02/1998Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/23/1998Brief Filed
06/23/1998Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/23/1998No oral argument requested
06/23/1998Brief received.
05/14/1998Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/30/1998Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/20/1998Response to _____________.
02/12/1998Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/06/1998Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/15/1998Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
01/12/1998Motion for leave to file brief
01/07/1998Brief Filed
01/07/1998Case ready to be set
01/07/1998Brief received.
01/07/1998No oral argument requested
12/15/1997Green card in
12/11/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/11/1997Order Entered
12/01/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/24/1997Green card in
11/20/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/20/1997Order Entered
11/10/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/31/199710 day letter sent
10/16/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/08/1997Letter sent
10/06/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/03/199710 day letter sent
10/01/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/28/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/19/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/26/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/19/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/19/1997Exhibits Filed
05/19/1997Statement of Facts Filed
05/19/1997Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
04/30/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/18/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
02/27/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/14/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
02/03/1997Transcript Filed
01/14/1997Notice of Appeal Filed
01/14/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/03/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHon. Carlos Valdez
Perez, Eric AldoAppellantEric Aldo Perez
Patrick J. McGuire
Trial Court Information
347th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Joaquin Villarreal
96-CR-0774-H(S2)
45 yrs TDCJ