judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0640-94
PD-0640-94
06/08/1994
PDR Case Type
PATTERSON, TINA LACHIEL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/07/1994RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/13/1995REHEAR RECEIVED
02/13/1995REHEAR REJECTED
02/10/1995FINAL DISPRefused
01/25/1995PDR DISPRefused
01/25/1995PDR DISPRefused
07/07/1994RESPONSE FILED
06/08/1994PDR FILED
06/08/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/17/1995STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn B. Holmes
PATTERSON, TINA LACHIELApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Charles Hinton
Court of Appeals Information:
14-93-00970-CR
AFF 5-5-94
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
Honorable MICHAEL T. MCSPADDEN
594931