judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-97-00028-CV
08-97-00028-CV
01/16/1997
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Brown, C. M., Individually and d/b/a C. M. Brown Construction Co. and Martine Grost
American General Co., American General Fire and Casualty Co., Sunco Leasing, Inc., Robert Winters, and Associated Insurance Agency
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/02/1997Judgment IssuedDismissed
04/02/1997Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/02/1997Judgment IssuedDismissed
04/02/1997Submission
04/02/1997Submitted
03/06/1997Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/06/1997Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/06/1997Motion to be passed and considered with the casePass & Consider W/Case
03/06/1997Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
02/11/1997Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
02/11/1997Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
02/11/1997Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
01/29/1997A Reply Filed in Answer to a Response Filed
01/29/1997Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
01/28/1997Miscellaneous Motion Filed
01/28/1997Motion for Dismissal Filed
01/28/1997Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
01/16/1997Motion for Dismissal Filed
01/16/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/02/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
AMERICAN GENERAL CO., AMERICANAppelleeSteven L. Hughes
BROWN, C. M., INDIVIDUALLY ANDAppellantHon. H. Robert Hayes
Hon. Richard L. Bischoff
Hon. Alfonso L. Melendez
Hon. Daniel R. Malone
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 5
El Paso
89-10121