judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-97-00014-CR
03-97-00014-CR
01/16/1997
Habeas corpus appeal
Ex Parte Rueben Shumake
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/28/1999Case stored
12/01/1997Mandate Issued
10/02/1997Correction filed
09/25/1997Opinion issuedDismissed for Want of Jurisdiction
05/22/1997list of additional authorities
05/22/1997Submitted
05/22/1997Submission
04/28/1997Oral argument acknowledged
04/22/1997Oral argument acknowledged
04/14/1997Submission
02/20/1997Motion for oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/14/1997Motion for oral argument filed
02/06/1997Brief filed
02/06/1997Case ready to be set
02/05/1997Mot ext time file STRANS DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/30/1997Supplemental Transcript filed
01/28/1997Brief filed
01/28/1997Mt extension of time file Supplemental Trans filed
01/16/1997Statement of Facts Filed
01/16/1997Transcript filed/no order
01/16/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/01/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMr. C. Bryan Case Jr.
The Honorable Ronald Earle
Shumake, Rueben Ex ParteAppellantMr. Terry M. Keel
Mr. Terrence W. Kirk
Trial Court Information
167th District Court
Travis
Honorable Michael F. Lynch
0965591