judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-97-00025-CV
02-97-00025-CV
01/17/1997
Miscellaneous civil
Dal-Lite Sales, Inc.
Freeman Electric Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/13/1998Mandate Issued
09/03/1998Petition for Review Filed in Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Denied
06/30/1998Petition for Review Filed in Supreme Court
05/07/1998Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
11/18/1997Submitted
11/18/1997Submission
10/15/1997Letter
06/06/1997Brief Filed
06/06/1997Case ready to be set
05/20/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/20/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/24/1997Brief Filed
01/27/1997Submission
01/21/1997Exhibits Filed
01/21/1997No Description Available.
01/17/1997No Description Available.
01/17/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/13/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dal-lite Sales, Inc.AppellantKenneth A. Herridge
Freeman Electric CompanyAppelleeEdward G. Markey
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Tarrant
Honorable Steven C. Wallace
91-47533-2