judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6860
B-6860
06/22/1977
Application for Writ of Error
LOMAS AND NETTLETON COMPANY
MARION HUCKABEE AND DORIS HUCKABEE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/30/1977Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/11/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
06/22/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/08/1977Response to Motion filed
11/30/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/16/1977Document received (See Remarks)
11/16/1977Opinion issued
11/16/1977Notice of Appearance
11/16/1977Document received (See Remarks)
11/16/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/11/1977Response to Petition
06/22/1977Document received (See Remarks)
06/22/1977Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lomas and Nettleton CompanyPetitioner
Marion Huckabee and Doris HuckabeeRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information