judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROY POWELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1332
Short Caption:ROY POWELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3457-84Filed Date:10/19/1988

Opening Event Date:10/19/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRoy Powell N
Walter S. BoothNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901POWELL, ROY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 SEE 85-1689 NOTE - 01
10/19/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD R
12/23/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/23/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO DISMISS & CASE DISMISSED. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 121488 SCHPRD Q
12/23/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
01/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD