judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TEXAS AND PACIFIC RAILWAY COMPANY v. MRS. G. J. RILEY, ADMINISTRATIX

Case: A-443
A-443
01/09/1945
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS AND PACIFIC RAILWAY COMPANY
MRS. G. J. RILEY, ADMINISTRATIX
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/10/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/29/1945Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
01/27/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
01/09/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/26/1945Response to Motion filed
02/10/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/29/1945Supplemental Brief filed
01/27/1945Response to Petition
01/13/1945Additional Copies received
01/09/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
01/09/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas and Pacific Railway CompanyPetitioner
Mrs. G. J. Riley, AdministratixRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information