judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONALD (GARY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38107
Short Caption:DONALD (GARY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C105946Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/13/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/29/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-11069
07/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 37685/37761/38086/38107/38108/38109/38112-cases are not consolidated. 01-12553
11/13/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. 01-18846
11/13/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/19/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. For the reasons stated in the attached orderof the district court, we conclude that the district properly denied appellant's petition. Therefore, briefing and oral argument are not warranted in this case. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-06997
05/14/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-07349
05/14/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 16, 2002. 02-07349