judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEIL M. WEISS; SAM JAY WEISS; and STAN L. WEISS, in their capacities as Limited Partners of the Weiss Limited Partnership v. MELVIN J. WEISS and JOHANNA WEISS RICHARDS and MORRIS WEISS

Case Heading (S-07-0117)
Case Number:S-07-0117Case Docketed On:05/30/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Corporations, Partnerships and Associations (Title 17)
Short Title:NEIL M. WEISS; SAM JAY WEISS; and STAN L. WEISS, in their capacities as Limited Partners of the Weiss Limited Partnership v. MELVIN J. WEISS and JOHANNA WEISS RICHARDS and MORRIS WEISS
Full Title:NEIL M. WEISS; SAM JAY WEISS; and STAN L. WEISS, in their capacities as Limited Partners of the Weiss Limited Partnership, Appellants (Defendants), v. MELVIN J. WEISS, Appellee (Plaintiff), and JOHANNA WEISS RICHARDS and MORRIS WEISS, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantNeil M. WeissSteve C.M. Aron
AppellantSam Jay WeissSteve C.M. Aron
AppellantStan L. WeissSteve C.M. Aron
AppelleeMelvin J. WeissDale W. Cottam
Lindsay Ann Woznick
AppelleeJohanna Weiss RichardsMarvin L. Tyler
AppelleeMorris WeissRoger Fransen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 30
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/30/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/30/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/30/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/17/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of recordBriefAppellantFinal
08/20/2007Motion - Intervene by Johanna Weiss RichardsMotionInterveneFinal
08/20/2007Motion - Intervene by Morris WeissMotionInterveneFinal
08/31/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/31/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/31/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/04/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/05/2007Order - Granting motions to intervene.OrderGrantFinal
10/04/2007Brief - Appellee Johanna Weiss RichardsBriefAppelleeFinal
10/04/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record; and received copy of appellees brief on disk.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/10/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/15/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Dale W. Cottam for Melvin Weiss.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/15/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Marvin Tyler for Johanna Weiss Richards.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/15/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Roger C. FransenNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Roger Fransen for Melvin J. Weiss, et al.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/19/2007Motion - Oral argument - vacate and rescheduleMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
10/19/2007Order - Oral argument - amending schedule - rescheduled from 11/15/07 to 11/14/07OrderOral argument - amending scheduleFinal
10/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/01/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, six volumes. Volumes I-IV, original papers; Volume V, transcript; Volume VI, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
11/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Steve C.M. Aron for appellants; Dale W. Cottam, Roger Fransen and Marvin L. Tyler, argument by Messrs. Cottam, Fransen and Tyler for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/20/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Fees past dueNotice-OutgoingFees past dueFinal
04/07/2008Record - Record returned to agencyRecordRecord returned to agencyFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/07/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/10/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal