judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM M. JOHNSON V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKS

Case Information: 10-AA-0892
Short Caption:WILLIAM M. JOHNSON V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Public Works
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DPW03223-10Filed Date:07/20/2010

Opening Event Date:07/20/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/01/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerWilliam M. Johnson NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Public WorksN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/20/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
07/20/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
07/22/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
08/02/2010 ORDERED that LEONARD T. GARRET shall w/n 20 days from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed EITHER for LACK OF STANDING; OR how he is AGGRIEVED by the Final Order, since he was not named as a party below. (BY: ETW)
08/02/2010TMC - PFR b/Garrett - OTSC
11/08/2010 ORDERED that this PFR IS HEREBY DISMISSED for LACK OF STANDING. See DC Code 2-510-(a)(2001);...SEE HARDCOPY (OBNBST) (cb)
11/08/2010DISMISSED
12/01/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived