judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LESTER T. BARBOUR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1315
Short Caption:LESTER T. BARBOUR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12782-87Filed Date:10/14/1988

Opening Event Date:10/14/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/07/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/19/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/08/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/05/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLester T. Barbour N
Robert W. ManceYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Mary B. Murphy YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BARBOUR, LESTER T. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 2/21/89 ORD: DENY APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 01 REINSTATE APPEAL W/O PREJUDICE NOTE - 02 TO ITS RENEWAL AT THE TIME THE NOTE - 02 DR/SRT ARE LODGED W/THIS CT. NOTE - 03 4/13/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 03 TO REINSTATE CASE & APLT TO NOTE - 04 MAKE ARRANGEMENTS TO HAVE REC NOTE - 04 FILED.
10/14/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/22/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA, SRT & FEE OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 102488 SCHPRD DSA
12/15/1988ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 120888 SCHPRD DSA
01/03/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO REINSTATE APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1989$50.00 DOCKETING FEE GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1989$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1989RECEIVED DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 AND 2 SL PANELRO SCDATE 011989 SCHPRD CHECK
03/07/1989FiledRecord Completed
03/07/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (140 PGS/SALAZAR) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1989ORDER DIRG APLT TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 40 DAYS. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO REINSTATE APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1989RECEIVED STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1989RECEIVED DESIGNATION OF RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1989DESIGNATION OF RECORD DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03 & 04. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 040489 SCHPRD X
04/13/1989STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/05/1989ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD R
06/14/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 061589 SCHPRD BA
07/19/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-18-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 071989 SCHPRD BE
07/25/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/18/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 072189 SCHPRD X
08/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-19-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 081889 SCHPRD BE
09/12/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/19/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 090689 SCHPRD X
09/19/1989FiledBriefing Completed
09/19/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 091989 SCHPRD BE
02/08/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWFEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWFEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/05/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD