judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PAUL N. BYRD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1371
Short Caption:PAUL N. BYRD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3019-85Filed Date:10/31/1988

Opening Event Date:10/31/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/21/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/08/1990
Argued/Submitted:06/26/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/23/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPaul N. Byrd N
Gregory C. Powell YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kirby D. Behre YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BYRD, PAUL N. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 3/31/89 ORD: GRT APPLICATION NOTE - 01 OF APLT TO PROCEED IN FORMA NOTE - 02 PAUPERIS AND CLK OF SUP.CT. IS NOTE - 02 DIRTD TO FILE THE RECORD ON NOTE - 03 APPEAL WITH THIS CT. W/O FEE NOTE - 03 FORTHWITH. FO THAT APLT SHALL NOTE - 04 FILE THE DKTG STMT W/I 10 DAYS NOTE - 04 FM DATE OF THIS ORDER. NOTE - 05 6/21/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 05 FILE DKTG STMT AND THE CLK IS NOTE - 06 DIRTD TO FILE THE LODGED DKTG NOTE - 06 STMT. FO THAT GREGORY C. NOTE - 07 POWELL, ESQUIRE, IS HEREBY NOTE - 07 APPTD AS CNSL TO REPRESENT NOTE - 08 APLT ON THIS APPEAL. FO THAT NOTE - 08 THE BRF OF APLT SHALL BE FILED NOTE - 09 W/I 40 DAYS FM DATE OF THIS NOTE - 09 ORDER.
10/31/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/31/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPELLANT'S PRO SE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1989LETTER DATED 1/30/89, FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, RE STATUS OF CASE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1989LETTER DATED 2/7/89, FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, RE STATUS OF CASE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1989RECEIVED LETTER DATED 3/22/89 FROM CLERK, USCA, TRANSMITTING 2 LETTERS FROM APPELLANT MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 4 SL PANELRO SCDATE 110388 SCHPRD Q
04/12/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD R
04/13/1989MEMORANDUM APLT CALLED TO CHANGE ADDRESS; NEEDS NEW C/U FOR DSA ORD WE SENT WAS LOST IN THE MOVE RJG PANEL SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD DSA
04/18/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT PRO SE FOR PROVISION OF BLANK DSA & EXT OF TIME TO FILE IT FOR 30 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 042889 SCHPRD DSA
05/02/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PRO SE DOCKETING STATEMENT MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/21/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GREGORY C. POWELL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 THRU 9 SL PANELRO SCDATE 042489 SCHPRD CHECK
08/03/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-30-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD BA
08/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/30/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081589 SCHPRD OPE
09/01/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/29/89 GG PANEL SCDATE 083089 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/28/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD OPE
10/02/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 20, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 092989 SCHPRD BA
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/20/89. GW PANELDDW SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD Q
10/24/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 27, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 102089 SCHPRD BA
10/31/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT' BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989ORDER DIRG CLK TO FILE LODGED BA; FO APLE'S BR TO BE FILED W/IN 30 DAYS. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO FILE TRANSCRIPTS OF COURT PROCEEDINGS AS A SR AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989ORDER GRANTING APLT'S MOT & DIRG CLK TO FILE TRANSC AS SUPP REC ON APPEAL. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #'S 1-4 - 6 PGS RIZZA; 6 PGS FINNERIN; 15 PGS SARGENT-BURNS 5 PGS DAVIS) FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/26/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-22-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 122289 SCHPRD BE
01/08/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/22/90. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 010490 SCHPRD V
01/22/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 21, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 012290 SCHPRD BE
02/21/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-22-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1990RECEIVED OF APLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/08/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/08/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/08/1990ORDER DIRG CLERK TO FILE APLE'S LODG BRIEF; CASE TO BE SCH FOR CON. AS SOON AS BIZ PERMITS. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/26/1990SUBMITTED RJG PANELBETEGA SCDATE 062690 SCHPRD CSUM
06/29/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELBETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/23/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/10/1990NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIDATED 8-23-90 IN SUPREME COURT #90-5527 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD Denied