judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RHONDA ABITBOL, a/k/a RHONDA VANHOUTEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0118)
Parent:S-07-0118Case Docketed On:05/31/2007
Consolidated: S-07-0186
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:RHONDA ABITBOL, a/k/a RHONDA VANHOUTEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RHONDA ABITBOL, a/k/a RHONDA VANHOUTEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRhonda AbitbolDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Diane Elizabeth Courselle
Ian Sonshine
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Bruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing -Credit for Time Served
Opinion Number:2008 WY 28
Citation:178 P.3d 415

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/31/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/31/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/31/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/13/2007Motion - Stay - other. Motion for stay of briefing schedule, in anticipation of consolidation of appeals.MotionStay - otherFinal
07/13/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/13/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/31/2007Order - Denying motion for stay of briefing scheduleOrderDenyFinal
08/21/2007Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
08/21/2007Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
10/02/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy on disk and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
10/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
11/05/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
11/08/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/03/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - D. Michael Pauling for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/04/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, five volumes. Volumes I - II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Information; Volume V, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Supplemental record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingSupplemental record on appeal filedFinal
12/05/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client for Ian Sonshine, Student Intern to appear on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
12/05/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Ian Sonshine for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/13/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Diane E. Courselle, Director, DAP and Ian Sonshine, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Sonshine for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/13/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/14/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming (S-07-0186) and affirming in part and reversing in part and remanding (S-07-0118). Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/01/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/01/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/01/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/01/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/04/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal