judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GRATIAN M. YATSEVITCH, ET AL V. JAMES BURK, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-0896
Short Caption:GRATIAN M. YATSEVITCH, ET AL V. JAMES BURK, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR2438-10Filed Date:07/09/2010

Opening Event Date:07/09/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/05/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/14/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGratian M. Yatsevitch N
Tyler KingYY
AppellantMonica L. Morrill N
Tyler KingYY
AppelleeJames Burk N
Deborah E. Mayer NN
AppelleeBurk & Reedy LlpN
Deborah E. Mayer NN
AppelleeChina Trade & Investments LLCN
Deborah E. Mayer NN
AppelleeSteve M. Allemang N
James E. Burk NN
AppelleeHard Money Barkers, LLCN
Eric L. Klein NN
David J. Shuster NN
Daniel MaulerNN
AppelleeJeffrey Stiller N
Eric L. Klein NN
David J. Shuster NN
Daniel MaulerNN
AppelleeNicholas Gehrig N
Daniel MaulerNN
Eric L. Klein NN
David J. Shuster NN
AppelleeThomas S. Logan N
David H. CoxNY
Eileen M. O'BrienNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (38-pgs/tape 4/22/10 proc.)
07/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (7-pgs/tape 5/21/10 proc.)
07/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (40-pgs/tape 6/11/10 proc.)w/cd attached
08/05/2010RECORD INDEX
08/05/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/09/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 9, 2010, the statement regarding transcript, and it appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is (MORE)
08/09/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App.R. 31. (JAC) elp
08/13/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY (Emergency) for an Injunction Pending Appeal
08/16/2010TMC - EMERGENCY motion for stay - motion for leave to file motion in excess pages - motion for expedited consideration of motion for stay
08/16/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file motion in excess of 20 pages
08/16/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION requesting ruling on plaintiffs' motion for injunction before the normal time for responses will expire
08/17/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION - to aplt's emergency motion for injunction pending appeal joint
08/19/2010 ORDERED that the MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT IS GRANTED; however, the parties are directed to comply with page limitations in future filings. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION REQUESTING AN EXPEDITED RULING IS GRANTED. It is *****MORE*****
08/19/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STAY IS DENIED as appellant has failed to establish the necessary factors for entry of a stay. See Barry v. Washington Post Co....It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S BRIEF AND JOINT APPENDIX REMAIN DUE SEPTEMBER 10, 2010... (KRTHKG) (cb)
08/19/2010MISCELLANEOUS - disclosure statement of Hard Money Bankers.
09/21/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
09/21/2010APPENDIX
09/23/2010MISCELLANEOUS- aple's suggestion of bankruptcy (Thomas Logan)
09/30/2010 On consideration of appellee Thomas S. Logan's suggestion of bankruptcy, and it appearing that appellant Gratian Yatsevitch has filed a petition for bankruptcy in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Columbia, case number 10-00828, pursuant to 11 U.S.C. $ 362 (1988), it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby stayed pending further order of this court. It is (MORE)
09/30/2010CASE STAYED
09/30/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the stay shall remain in effect and no action will be taken by this court until one of more parties moves to vacate the stay in this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall inform this court immediately upon the termination of stay by the United States Bankrupcty Court. (ETW) elp
10/07/2010NOTICE RECEIVED- from aplt- of dismissal of bankruptcy
10/19/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 30, 2010, which stayed this appeal, and directed parties to notify this court immediately upon the termination of the bankruptcy stay, and appellants notice of dismissal of the bankruptcy stay, and it appearing that appellant's brief and appendix were filed with this court on September 21, 2010, it is ORDERED that the stay entered by this court on September 30, 2010, is hereby vacated. It is (MORE)
10/19/2010PROCEED WITH APPEAL, NO LONGER ON HOLD/STAYED
10/19/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (ETW) elp
11/16/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (*JOINT UNOPPOSED) elp
11/22/2010 On consideration of the parties' joint unopposed motion to dismiss this appeal, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b). (ETW) elp
11/22/2010DISMISSED
12/14/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived