judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOWARD (REGINALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38108
Short Caption:HOWARD (REGINALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 32854 , 37692 , 38604 , 41115 , 43031 , 49851 , 67750
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C147014Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Agosti for Justice GibbonsPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/13/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/29/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-11070
07/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 37685/37761/38086/38107/38108/38109/38112-cases are not consolidated. 01-12554
11/13/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 3. 01-18841
11/13/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/06/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/15/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn21[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP03-DA/RR/WM 03-00815
03/04/2003Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP03-DA/RR/WM 03-03577
04/01/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-03632
04/01/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/07/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 3, 2003. 03-03632