judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM WATKINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1424
Short Caption:WILLIAM WATKINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:88-CF-1424Consolidated: 88-CV-1488
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2948-88Filed Date:10/31/1988

Opening Event Date:10/31/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/12/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/25/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/25/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/15/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam Watkins N
W. Douglas WhamYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WATKINS, WILLIAM UNITED STATES
10/31/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/08/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
05/12/1989FiledRecord Completed
05/12/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/12/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (83 PGS/MOLLICHELLI) AD PANEL SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD R
06/16/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 24, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 062189 SCHPRD BA
06/22/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/24/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 062689 SCHPRD CHECK
07/24/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 072489 SCHPRD BA
08/25/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/25/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 082589 SCHPRD BE
01/25/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/25/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELBETEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1990SUBMITTED PANELBETEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/15/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD