judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VERTRESE B. CHAMBERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1426
Short Caption:VERTRESE B. CHAMBERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11313-87Filed Date:11/09/1988

Opening Event Date:11/09/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/08/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/13/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/15/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/09/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVertrese B. Chambers N
Steven Weinberg YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Anthony P. Farley YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CHAMBERS, VERTRESE B. UNITED STATES
11/09/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
05/16/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (147 PGS/MILLER AND WRAY) AD PANEL SCDATE 010989 SCHPRD R
06/08/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/08/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(127 PGS/LEWIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
07/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 21ST (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 071889 SCHPRD BA
07/25/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/21/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 072189 SCHPRD M
08/21/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD BA
09/25/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-11-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 092589 SCHPRD BE
10/11/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989FiledBriefing Completed
10/13/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLE IS FL; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD M
02/15/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/15/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGSCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGSCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/09/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD