Case: 05-96-00760-CR
05-96-00760-CR
05/16/1996
Other Felony
Moffett, Emanuel
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/10/1998 | Letter Sent by the Court |
| |||
08/27/1998 | Letter Received | | |||
08/03/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |||
08/03/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |||
07/06/1998 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||
05/27/1998 | Ext to file Petition for Discretionary Review Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/06/1998 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | | ||
05/06/1998 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | | ||
02/17/1998 | Submitted | | |||
02/17/1998 | Submission | | |||
02/17/1998 | Submitted | | |||
01/06/1998 | Letter Filed | | |||
12/29/1997 | Submission | | |||
05/21/1997 | MattConv | | |||
05/15/1997 | Brief Filed | | |||
05/15/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |||
05/15/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |||
04/23/1997 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
04/21/1997 | MattConv | | |||
04/21/1997 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
02/07/1997 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
02/04/1997 | MattConv | | |||
02/04/1997 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
01/15/1997 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/10/1997 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
01/07/1997 | Brief Filed | | |||
01/07/1997 | MattConv | | |||
11/14/1996 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/07/1996 | MattConv | | |||
10/17/1996 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
10/09/1996 | MattConv | | |||
10/08/1996 | MattConv | | |||
10/08/1996 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/07/1996 | Record due | | |||
10/04/1996 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |||
08/21/1996 | Transcript Filed | | |||
05/20/1996 | Notice Sent | | |||
05/16/1996 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
05/09/1996 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | | |||
05/09/1996 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |||
05/09/1996 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/03/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Libra Joy (Libby) Lange |
Moffett, Emanuel | Criminal - Appellant | Douglas H. Parks |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Mark S Tolle
F96-00802-J
LIFE/$10,000 FINE