judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FRANKLIN SEEGERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1428
Short Caption:FRANKLIN SEEGERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F48836-73Filed Date:11/09/1988

Opening Event Date:11/09/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/20/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/01/1989
Argued/Submitted:03/15/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFranklin Seegers N
John M. Dahut NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Thomas Lumbard YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Geoffrey G. Bestor YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SEEGERS, FRANKLIN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: DUTCH SMITH & RONNIE NOTE - 01 PHILLIPS NOTE - 02 7/18/89 ORDER GRANT MOTION OF NOTE - 02 APPELLANT TO CONSOLIDATE THE NOTE - 03 TRANSCRIPT IN APPEAL #9022 IS NOTE - 03 DEEMED A SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD NOTE - 04 & BRF OF APLT IS DUE IN 40 NOTE - 04 DAYS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/03/15 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - LUMBARDT FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BESTORG FOR - APPELLEE
03/05/1975SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (509 PGS. -- FAMILANT) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1975SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (41 PGS. -- HOUGHTON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/16/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1988$50.00 DOCKETING FEE GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1988$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/20/1989FiledRecord Completed
04/20/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/20/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 120988 SCHPRD R
04/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH RECORD IN #9022 AND TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 053089 SCHPRD BA
07/18/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 2-4 PB PANELRO SCDATE 052489 SCHPRD Q
07/18/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (TRANSCRIPT IN # 9022) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 1ST (NO OPA) JB PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD BE
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/01/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD M
10/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 1, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 110189 SCHPRD BE
11/06/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MXBE FILED 10-30-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD OPA
11/22/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING BE TO AND INCLUDING 12/1/89. NFX FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989FiledBriefing Completed
12/01/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 120189 SCHPRD BE
03/15/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/15/1990ARGUED PANELRGNWSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGNWSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD