judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KELVIN L. HOLMES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1427
Short Caption:KELVIN L. HOLMES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 88-AA-1203 Consolidated:88-CF-1427
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2128-86Filed Date:11/09/1988

Opening Event Date:11/09/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/20/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/26/1990
Argued/Submitted:05/17/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/14/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKelvin L. Holmes N
David Carey WollYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
David M. Zlotnick YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HOLMES, KELVIN L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 11/17/88 ORD: SS, CONS 86-1203 NOTE - 01 & 88-1427; W/D APPRNC OF NOTE - 02 KOSMAS JOHNS W/D IN 86-1203; NOTE - 02 APLT TO FL DSA IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 03 CON 86-1203 NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 02/26/90 ORD: RECORD & BRIEF NOTE - 04 ALONE DENIED; FO CLK DIRED TO NOTE - 05 SCH FOR CONSIDERATION AS SOON NOTE - 05 AS BUS OF COURT PERMITS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/05/17 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - WOLLD FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - ZLOTNICKD FOR - APPELLEE
11/09/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID CAREY WOLL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 & 02. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 010988 SCHPRD R
11/21/1988RECEIVED COPY OF MOTION FILED IN TRIAL COURT BY P.T. GOURDOUROS FOR APPELLANT FOR F.P. MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988ORDER SS, W/D APPRNC OF PETER T. GOURDOUROS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/20/1989FiledRecord Completed
04/20/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/20/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 010989 SCHPRD R
04/25/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(136 PGS/PIRFO) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-29-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 053089 SCHPRD BA
06/12/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/29/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 060989 SCHPRD CHECK
06/26/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 1, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 062989 SCHPRD BA
07/06/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/1/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 070689 SCHPRD CHECK
07/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/15/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 080189 SCHPRD BA
08/02/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/15/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD Q
08/14/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 081589 SCHPRD BA
10/04/1989ORDER BRF OF APLE DUE IN 10 DAYS OR SCHED CASE ON REC & BRF OF APLT ALONE. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 091389 SCHPRD BE
12/26/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT RE 10-4-89 ORDER AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 6, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD BE
01/17/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MO TO CONSIDER APPEAL W/OUT BRIEF OF APPELLEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1990APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MXBE FILED 1-17-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD OPA
02/06/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1990FiledBriefing Completed
02/26/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1990ORDER GRTG MXBE & DIRG CLK TO FILE LODGED BE; FO MOT TO SCH ON (SEE NOTE FIELDS 4-5) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/17/1990ARGUED PANELBESCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/23/1990REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV JUDGMENT OF CONVIC TION/CAUSE RM FOR A NEW TRIAL. PANELBESCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/23/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -SW CITE 580 A.2d 1259
08/23/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 2512
09/14/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1990ORDER sua sponte AMENDING 8/23/90 OPINION...F/O THAT MANDATE NOT AFFECTED. (printed @ 2511A-1) PANELBESCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD