judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT THOMAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1410
Short Caption:ROBERT THOMAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9027-87Filed Date:10/31/1988

Opening Event Date:10/31/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/14/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/13/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/26/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/25/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert Thomas N
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Mark J. Rochon YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Maritn D. Carpenter YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901THOMAS, ROBERT UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/02/26 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - ROCHONM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - CARPENTERM FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 PDS VACATED
10/31/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/14/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AND DR AD PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
11/28/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (342 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 123088 SCHPRD R
06/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(93 PGS/SCHERTZER) AD PANEL SCDATE 070289 SCHPRD RT
07/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (379 PGS. -- GOAD) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (480 PGS - GOAD) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (55 PGS - GOAD) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (127 PGS RT - JACKSON) GT PANEL SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD RT
08/09/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (10 PGS. -- GOAD) RJG PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
08/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (30 PGS. -- VAN BREMEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL RECORD IS SUPPLEMENTED WITH TRANSCRIPT FROM 8/10/89 RJG PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD BA
09/12/1989ORDER DIRG THAT APLT'S BR BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM DATE COMPL RECORD INC. RTC FILED. ACG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8( 17 PGS. -- JACKSON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 123089 SCHPRD RT
03/15/1990APPEARANCE FOR APLE ATTORNEY MARK J. ROCHON AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO ENTER APPEAR- ANCE & SET SCHEDULING DATE 40 DAYS FROM APPEARANCE RJG PANEL SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD BA
06/11/1990ORDER BRF OF APLE DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 052390 SCHPRD OPE
07/20/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR AN ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS RJG (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 072390 SCHPRD BA
07/27/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF ON OR BEFORE 8/23/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 072390 SCHPRD B
08/21/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO TWO WEEKS (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 082390 SCHPRD BA
08/24/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/6/90; DAS PANELFF SCDATE 082390 SCHPRD TO
09/18/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO FOR LV TO FL LODGE BRF; APLE'S BRF SHALL BE FL W/IN 30 DAYS. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 100590 SCHPRD B
10/14/1990FiledRecord Completed
11/13/1990FiledBriefing Completed
11/13/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 111290 SCHPRD BE
02/26/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/26/1991ARGUED PANELFEWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/25/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD