judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HAROLD ANTHONY MCCALL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0548
Short Caption:HAROLD ANTHONY MCCALL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M1349-89Filed Date:05/18/1989

Opening Event Date:05/18/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/21/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/08/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/10/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/13/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHarold Anthony Mccall N
John M. CopacinoYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Guizelous O. Molock YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCCALL, HAROLD ANTHONY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 GRT APLE MO FOR LV TO FL LODGE NOTE - 01 BRF. FO THAT APPEAL SHALL BE NOTE - 02 SCHDEDULED FOR CONSID. BEFORE NOTE - 02 A MERITS DIV. AS SOON AS THE NOTE - 03 CALENDAR PERMITS. NOTE - 03
05/18/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/30/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1989ORDER SS, JOHN M. COPACINO APPTD FOR APLT. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1989FiledRecord Completed
08/21/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 072489 SCHPRD R
10/02/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 11TH (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD BA
10/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FL BRF TO 11/1/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD M
11/01/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 110189 SCHPRD BA
11/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 4, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 120689 SCHPRD BE
12/19/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRIEF TO 1/4/90 GW PANELRBH SCDATE 121489 SCHPRD V
12/19/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(102 PGS/RAMOS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-6-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 010490 SCHPRD BE
01/26/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/6/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 012290 SCHPRD V
04/09/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 020690 SCHPRD BE
04/09/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/08/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 042790 SCHPRD B
10/10/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/10/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGSTMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGSTMA SCDATE 101090 SCHPRD RDEC
11/21/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -RO CITE
12/13/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD