judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STEPHEN ANTHONY HARDY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1304
Short Caption:STEPHEN ANTHONY HARDY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SP1854-88Filed Date:10/19/1988

Opening Event Date:10/19/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/20/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/07/1991
Argued/Submitted:03/02/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/12/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantStephen Anthony Hardy N
Thomas Reed Kennedy YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth H. DanelloYY
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARDY, STEPHEN ANTHONY UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/9/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE BY NOTE - 01 8/23/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 02 9/27/91; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 02 10/16/91; SCHED CASE ON NOTE - 03 JANUARY 1992 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 8/29/91 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 04 TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLT IS DUE NOTE - 05 BY 9/4/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 05 10/9/91 & REPLY BRF OF APLT,IF NOTE - 06 ANY, DUE BY 10/28/91; CASE TO NOTE - 06 REMAIN SCHED ON JAN 1991 CAL.
10/19/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE APPEAL APPEAL OF EXTRADITION ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1988ORDER DENYING MO FOR EXPEDITED APPEAL OF EXTRADITION ORDER. ACG PANELFERO SCDATE 102788 SCHPRD OPE
11/29/1988ORDER APPNTNG THOMAS REED KENNEDY, ESQ., TO REPRESENT APLT; DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD DSA
11/29/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) Thomas Reed Kennedy, Esq.
12/09/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 120988 SCHPRD DSA
04/11/1991ORDER CLK OF SUPER CRT W/I 10 DAYS PREPARD & TRANSMIT REC TO THIS CRT W/O FEE. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 032691 SCHPRD V
04/12/1991RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 042291 SCHPRD R
05/24/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (7-PGS/HAWKINS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 051791 SCHPRD RT
06/20/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (8-PGS/SCHERTZER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 070191 SCHPRD CHECK
06/20/1991RECORD COMPLETED
07/09/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03 FOR ADVANCED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 062791 SCHPRD GR
08/23/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS - NO OPPO PMB PANEL SCDATE 082391 SCHPRD BA
08/29/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-06. DAS PANELTE SCDATE 082691 SCHPRD T
09/04/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 090491 SCHPRD BA
10/07/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 100991 SCHPRD BE
10/07/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/02/1991ORDER COURT'S 7/9/91 ORD MODIFIED TO EXTEND CASE TO BE SCHEDULED FEB 1992. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/02/1992SUBMITTED PANELFEWGKG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1992DISMISSED MOJ (FE WG KG)
06/12/1992MANDATE ISSUED