judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PETER C. ROBINSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1303
Short Caption:PETER C. ROBINSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2107-88Filed Date:10/11/1988

Opening Event Date:10/11/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/01/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/06/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/13/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/30/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPeter C. Robinson N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Mary B. Murphy YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ROBINSON, PETER C. UNITED STATES
10/11/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/10/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL J. DOWD, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 112188 SCHPRD DSA
03/01/1989FiledRecord Completed
03/01/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (210 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD R
04/10/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-10-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD BA
04/26/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/10/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 042089 SCHPRD CHECK
05/10/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 051089 SCHPRD BA
05/31/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-6-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 060989 SCHPRD BE
06/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/6/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 060889 SCHPRD M
07/06/1989FiledBriefing Completed
07/06/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 070689 SCHPRD BE
12/13/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/13/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/30/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD