judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EARL B. NICHOLS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0565
Short Caption:EARL B. NICHOLS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M4636-89Filed Date:05/30/1989

Opening Event Date:05/30/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/29/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEarl B. Nichols N
Reginald G. Addison NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901NICHOLS, EARL B. UNITED STATES
05/30/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/30/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR BAIL/BOND PENDING APPEAL APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) REGINALD G. ADDISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1989APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR REVIEW & MODIFI- CATION OF CONDITIONS OF RELEASE JB PANEL SCDATE 060689 SCHPRD OPE
08/25/1989ORDER APLT OTSC WHY APPEAL SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AS DUPLICATIVE OF 89-564. ACG PANELRO SCDATE 061989 SCHPRD CHECK
08/29/1989FiledRecord Completed
08/29/1989RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL (6 PGS/HUNT) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S ANSWER TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RJG PANEL SCDATE 090589 SCHPRD ANSA
09/12/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
09/12/1989ORDER CASE DISMISSED AS DUPLICATIVE OF 89-564. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD X
09/12/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
10/27/1989RECEIVED RT(7 PGS/BRADLEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1990LETTER FROM USA/JUSTICE RE: ERROR RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD