judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EARL B. NICHOLS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0564
Short Caption:EARL B. NICHOLS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M4637-89Filed Date:05/30/1989

Opening Event Date:05/30/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/16/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEarl B. Nichols N
Reginald G. Addison NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901NICHOLS, EARL B. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/19/89 ORD: RECORD REMANDED NOTE - 01 FOR A STMT OF THE NATURE & NOTE - 02 CIRCUMSTANCES OF THE OFFENSE NOTE - 02 & WHY NO COMBINATION OF CONDI- NOTE - 03 TIONS OF RELEASE SHORT OF THE NOTE - 03 $10,000 SURETY BOND WOULD NOTE - 04 REASONABLY ASSURE DEFENDANT'S NOTE - 04 APPEARANCE; DECISION ON MO FOR NOTE - 05 BOND HELD IN ABEYANCE PENDING NOTE - 05 REMAND; CLK OF SUPER CT TO NOTE - 06 TRANSMIT TRIAL JUDGE'S STMT NOTE - 06 AS SUPP RECORD FORTHWITH.
05/30/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/30/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR BAIL/BOND PENDING APPEAL APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) REGINALD G. ADDISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-06. PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD VS
07/26/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
07/26/1989ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED AS MOOT DUE TO APLT'S RELEASE INTO THIRD PARTY CUSTODY. MEH PANELMKSC SCDATE 072589 SCHPRD VS
07/26/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
08/16/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD