judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TAFT JACKSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0599
Short Caption:TAFT JACKSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M11428-88Filed Date:10/28/1988

Opening Event Date:10/28/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/22/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/04/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTaft Jackson N
David H. ReiterNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JACKSON, TAFT UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 6/14/89 ORDER GRT MO TO WITH- NOTE - 01 DRAW APPLICATION, FO DENY MO NOTE - 02 OF GERSON SIMON, ESQ. TO BE NOTE - 02 APPOINTED UNDER CJA, FO DAVID NOTE - 03 H. REITER, ESQ. IS APPOINTED NOTE - 03 AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT. FO NOTE - 04 GRT APPLICATION FOR ALLOWANCE NOTE - 04 OF APPEAL & DEEM THIS CASE NOTE - 05 89-599 & CLK IS TO TRANSMIT NOTE - 05 TO SUP. COURT THIS ORDER & NOTE - 06 APPLICATION TO TAKE ACTION NOTE - 06 PURSUANT TO RULE 6(D) & COUN- NOTE - 07 SEL W/IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA NOTE - 07 WITH THIS COURT. NOTE - 08 12/26/89 ORD: A RENEWED MOT NOTE - 08 INDICATING WHAT OTHER ATTEMPTS NOTE - 09 HAVE BEEN MADE TO LOCATE APLT, NOTE - 09 E.G., DC DEPT OF CORR, ETC.
10/28/1988APPLICATION FOR ALLOWANCE OF APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPLICATION UNTIL TRIAL COURT ACTS ON POST TRIAL MOTION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1988RECEIVED MOTION OF GERSON SIMON TO BE APPOINTED UNDER CJA RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO WITHDRAW TO STAY APPLICATION. MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID H. REITER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 1-7 PB PANELBETEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 081489 SCHPRD R
06/22/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/22/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 062689 SCHPRD DSA
09/22/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS OR REFERRED TO BPR. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 080189 SCHPRD BA
09/26/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD BA
11/08/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD U
12/01/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/26/1989ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS W/ OUT PREJ. TO COUNSEL'S FILING (SEE NOTE FIELDS 8 & 9) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL COURT'S ORDER DATED 12-26-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 011790 SCHPRD CHECK
01/24/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (58 PGS. -- WILDERMUTH) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1990ORDER APLT TO SHOW CAUSE IN 10 WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 011790 SCHPRD Q
04/13/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
04/13/1990ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR APLT'S FAILURE TO PROSECUTE APPEAL. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
05/04/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD