judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BERNARD E. COOPER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1396
Short Caption:BERNARD E. COOPER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6011-87Filed Date:10/27/1988

Opening Event Date:10/27/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/13/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBernard E. Cooper N
Diane K. Dildine NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COOPER, BERNARD E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: RODNEY NORTON & KEVIN NOTE - 01 L. PARKER
10/27/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DIANE K. DILDINE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
03/13/1989FiledRecord Completed
03/13/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/13/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (21 PGS/MOLLICHELLI) AD PANEL SCDATE 122788 SCHPRD R
04/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 29, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 042489 SCHPRD BA
05/10/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/24/89. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD M
05/11/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 052489 SCHPRD BA
05/15/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
05/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO WITHDRAW & DISMISS ON CONSENT. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 051289 SCHPRD M
05/15/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
06/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD