judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

REGINALD A. TAYLOR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1370
Short Caption:REGINALD A. TAYLOR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4123-88Filed Date:10/25/1988

Opening Event Date:10/25/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/22/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/24/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/20/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/13/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantReginald A. Taylor N
Michael C. Normile YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Eric M. Acker YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TAYLOR, REGINALD A. UNITED STATES
10/25/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/01/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL C. NORMILE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 122788 SCHPRD R
02/22/1990FiledRecord Completed
04/26/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/24/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 060190 SCHPRD BE
09/11/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (157 PGS - SHELTON) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/20/1990SUBMITTED PANELSTSCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSTSCRE SCDATE 112090 SCHPRD CSUM
11/21/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -RY CITE
12/13/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD