judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DUANE RICHARDS SCHINNER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1403
Short Caption:DUANE RICHARDS SCHINNER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10540-88Filed Date:11/07/1988

Opening Event Date:11/07/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/27/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDuane Richards Schinner N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SCHINNER, DUANE RICHARDS UNITED STATES
11/07/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/07/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 88-1296 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 010689 SCHPRD R
02/06/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
02/06/1989ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. ACG PANELMKBE SCDATE 112488 SCHPRD CHECK
02/06/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
02/27/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD