judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1352
Short Caption:CHARLES BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6320-87Filed Date:10/06/1988

Opening Event Date:10/06/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/20/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/13/1990
Argued/Submitted:04/25/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/22/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles Brown N
Matthew C. LeeferYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
George J. Lane YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWN, CHARLES AKA GARY C. HARRIS UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/04/25 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - LEEFERM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - LANEGE FOR - APPELLEE
10/06/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MATTHEW C. LEEFER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
03/01/1989RECORD ON APPEAL 9 PGS/RAMOS RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD R
07/18/1989ORDER GRANT MO FOR EXT TO FL RT; RT DUE IN 10 DAYS. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
07/20/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/20/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (306 PGS - CALHOUN) GT PANEL SCDATE 072889 SCHPRD RT
08/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-8-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 082989 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/8/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD OPE
10/11/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 100889 SCHPRD BA
10/11/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO FL BRF & APLE'S BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 102789 SCHPRD M
11/28/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-28-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 113089 SCHPRD BE
12/20/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLE'S BR TO AND INC. 12/28/89. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 25, 1990 NO OPPO AJ PANEL SCDATE 122889 SCHPRD BE
01/08/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/25/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 010490 SCHPRD V
01/25/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-30-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 012590 SCHPRD BE
01/30/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1990FiledBriefing Completed
02/13/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD V
04/25/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/25/1990ARGUED PANELTESCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/30/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELTESCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/30/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/22/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD