judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BRANTLEY WALKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1347
Short Caption:BRANTLEY WALKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F546-88Filed Date:10/06/1988

Opening Event Date:10/06/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/28/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/05/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/12/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/26/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBrantley Walker N
Joseph H. Green, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Erik P. Christian YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WALKER, BRANTLEY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: WILLIE ANDERSON NOTE - 01
10/06/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOSEPH H. GREEN, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
02/28/1989FiledRecord Completed
02/28/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD R
03/31/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD BA
04/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(367 PGS/FINNERIN)AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/05/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-5-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 050589 SCHPRD BE
05/10/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/5/89. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD M
06/02/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/5/89 (NO OPA) MLR PANEL SCDATE 060589 SCHPRD BE
06/12/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FILE BRF TO 7/5/89. ANY FUR REQ W/BE DISFAVORED. PB PANELDDW SCDATE 060789 SCHPRD V
07/05/1989FiledBriefing Completed
07/05/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 070589 SCHPRD BE
12/12/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/12/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELRGBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/26/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD