judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ARLIS Z. HICKS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1346
Short Caption:ARLIS Z. HICKS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead:88-CF-1346Consolidated: 91-CO-0994 , 91-CO-1472
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F367-88Filed Date:10/06/1988

Opening Event Date:10/06/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/26/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/23/1992
Argued/Submitted:03/17/1993
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/18/1993
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantArlis Z. Hicks Y
Richard S. Greenlee YN
James W. KleinNY
Brian C. Plitt NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Chrisellen R. KolbYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HICKS, ARLIS Z. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902FINNERIN - ORDERED 8/16/91 PROC. 12/14/89 - 12/15/89 RAMOS - ORDERED 8/20/91 PROC. 4/15/91 - 4/19/91 JONES - ORDERED 8/20/91 PROC. 4/8/91 - 4/9/91
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 8/24/90 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 TO REMAND REC & APLT TO FL A NOTE - 02 STATE PURSUANT TO R. 10(d) NOTE - 02 WITH THE TRL CRT AND A COPY TO NOTE - 03 THIS CRT. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 11/16/90 ORD: GRANTG APLT'S MO NOTE - 04 TO STAY APPEAL & APPEAL IS NOTE - 05 HEREBY STAYED PENDG F/O OF NOTE - 05 THIS CRT; F/O COUNSEL TO FL A NOTE - 06 STATEMNT W/THIS CRT W/IN 30 NOTE - 06 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF MO FOR NOTE - 07 NEW TRL FILED IN TRL CRT. NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 CONS: 91-994, 91-1472 NOTE - 08 NOTE - 10 01/10/92 ORD: SUA SPONTE THAT NOTE - 10 APPEAL NOS. 88-1346, 91-994 & NOTE - 11 91-1472 ARE CONSOLIDATED FR NOTE - 11 ALL PURPOSES HEREIN; JAMES NOTE - 12 KLEIN, ESQ IS HEREBY APPTD TO NOTE - 12 REPRESENT APLT IN NO. 91-1472; NOTE - 13 APLT IN NO. 91-1472 TO FL DSA NOTE - 13 IN 10 DAYS.
11/08/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT ORDERED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/14/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
11/14/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (19 PGS/DAVIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD R
10/26/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(337 PGS/SWARINGER) AD PANEL SCDATE 123088 SCHPRD RT
10/26/1989RECORD COMPLETED
12/05/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-4-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD BA
12/08/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 4, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/15/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING BA FOR A PERIOD OF 40 DAYS FROM DATE 7/11/88 TRANSC DOCKETED. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/01/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 081690 SCHPRD TO
08/29/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING STATEMENT PURSUANT TO DC APP. R. 10(d) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO & APLT TO FL STATMNT W/IN 14 DAYS PURS TO D.C. APP. R.10(D). GW PANELRO SCDATE 091390 SCHPRD V
10/03/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING STATEMENT PURSANT TO D.C APP. R. 10(d) AJ PANEL SCDATE 092890 SCHPRD STATE
10/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY FILING OF A STATE PURSUANT TO D.C. R 10(D) PENDING MO FOR NEW TRIAL IN SUP. CT. AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL STATMT PURS D.C. APP.R.10(D & STMNT DUE W/IN 14 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 100190 SCHPRD CHECK
11/16/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 4 THRU 7. GW PANELRO SCDATE 110590 SCHPRD STATE
12/17/1990STATEMENT OF APLT STATUS OF MOTION FOR NEW TRAIL AJ PANEL SCDATE 121790 SCHPRD STATE
02/13/1991ORDER COUNS FOR APLT TO ADVISE THIS CRT W/IN 30 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDG MO FL IN TRL CRT. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 020691 SCHPRD V
03/14/1991STATEMENT OF APPELLANT PURSUANT TO ORD FOR STATUS OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 031291 SCHPRD ANSA
05/07/1991ORDER APLT TO ADVISE CT W/IN 30 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF MO PENDING IN TRIAL CT. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 050391 SCHPRD K
06/21/1991ORDER APLT CNSL TO ADVISE THIS CRT W/IN 10 DYS FRM ORD DT AS TO STATUS OF PENDG TRL CRT MO. GR PANELJAC SCDATE 061191 SCHPRD GR
06/26/1991STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION IN TRIAL COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 070191 SCHPRD CHECK
08/06/1991ORDER CNSL FOR APLT TO ADVISE CRT IN 30 AS TO STATUS OF PNDNG MO IN TRIAL CRT. EVH PANELJAC SCDATE 080291 SCHPRD V
08/28/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (4 PGS/TANNER) 7/24/91 PROC. DTE. PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1991ORDER ORD SUA SPONTE THAT APPEAL NOS 88-1346 & 91-994 ARE CONSOL; APLT TO FL DSA IN 10. EVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1991STATEMENT OF APLT RE STATUS OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL PMB PANEL SCDATE 091391 SCHPRD STATE
09/06/1991ORDER ORD SUA SPONTE JAMES KLEIN,ESQ IS HEREBY APPTD AS CNSL FR APLT IN NO. 91-994. EVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (13 PGS/KACZOROWSKI) 3/29/88 - PROC. DTE. PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (45-PGS/BURNS 1/25/88) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (19 PGS. - SIMMS) (7/6/88 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (5 PGS. -- HERZFELD) (5/21/90 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OR CRT RPTR RAMOS FOR EXT. OF TM TO FL 4/15/91 - 4/19/91 PROC. TO 2/15/92. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF CRT RPTR JONES FOR EXT. OF TM TO FL TRIAL PROC. TO 11/19/91. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1991ORDER CNSL FR APLT TO ADVISE CRT IN 30 AS TO STATUS OF MO FR NEW TRIAL PNDNG IN TRL CRT. EVH PANELJAC SCDATE 101191 SCHPRD TT
10/21/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF CRT RPTR FINNERIN FOR EXT OF TM TO FL TRIAL PROC. TO 12/15/91. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6(13-PGS/HART 3/18/91 & 7/18/91 PROCEEDINGS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (10 PGS. -- SHELTON) (5/22/89 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1991ORDER DENY CT RPTR FINNERIN MOTION AS UNTIMELY FILED. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1991ORDER DENY CRT RPTR JONES MOTION AS UNTIMELY FILED. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #9 (8 PGS. -- SCHERTZER) (4/4/91 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1991ORDER GR MO OF CT RPTR RAMOS FOR EXT OF TM TO FL TR OF 4/15/91 - 4/19/91 PROC. TO 2/15/92. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1991STATEMENT OF APLT RE STATUS OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL PMB PANEL SCDATE 111891 SCHPRD STATE
12/20/1991ORDER CNSL FR APLT TO FL A STATE- MENT IN 20 INFORMING THIS CRT RE STATUS OF PNDNG RTS. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #9 (259-PGS/JONES) AJ PANEL SCDATE 102091 SCHPRD RT
01/10/1992MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT EX OF TM WITHIN WHICH TO FL STATE RE: TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 012192 SCHPRD STATE
01/10/1992ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 10-13. EVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/21/1992RECEIVED STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPT. AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1992ORDER GRT APLT MO TO FL LODGED STMT. APLT BRF W/I 40 DAYS AFTER COM REC OF APP FL W/THIS CRT. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 012292 SCHPRD B
01/24/1992STATEMENT JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #9 (523 PGS. -- HILTON) (4/22-24/91 PROCEEDINGS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #10 (8 PGS. -- SALONON) (12/15/89 PROCEEDINGS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1992ORDER Appellant to advise this court in 10 days whether any additional record is required for this appeal. Failure to advise this court within 10 days will result in the issuance of a briefing order. (By JEP)
04/06/1992RECEIVED STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT PER 3/24/92 ORDER
04/08/1992LETTER SENT TO APLT NEED MOTION TO LATE FILE STATEMENT DUE 4/3/92 RECVD ON 4/6/92
04/09/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #12 (22 pgs/bradley) proc. 7/7/88
04/13/1992APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file statement regarding status of transcripts.
05/29/1992The motion of aplt for leave to fl statement regarding status of transcript is granted and the lodged statement is hereby filed. The brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order and the brief of appellee shall be filedwithin 30 days thereafter. Any request for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only in extraordinary circumstances. (By JAC).
05/29/1992STATEMENT
07/08/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days
07/22/1992ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the brief of appellant shall be filed on or before August 20, 1992. No further requests for anextension of time will be granted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. (JEP)
08/20/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until 9/10/92. no oppo.
09/04/1992ORDER: Grant the motion of appellant for an extension of time within which to file its brief and the brief of appellant shall be filed on or before September 10, 1992. Any further request for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only in extraordinary circumstances. (ByJAC )
09/11/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
09/11/1992RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF.
09/29/1992ORDER: Grant motion of appellant for leave to filehis brief and the brief is filed; the brief of ap pellee shall be filed on or before October 19, 1992. (By WHN)
09/29/1992BRIEF - Appellant's Brief
10/19/1992APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to October 27, 1992 (no oppo).
10/27/1992RECEIVED - appellee's brief
11/23/1992ORD GRANT APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the lodged brief of appellee is filed. F/O that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (By WHG)
11/23/1992APPELLEE'S BRIEF
11/23/1992BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/22/1992FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
02/26/1993APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF
03/02/1993STIPULATION of appellant in re to missing documents from the appellate record.
03/02/1993APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD
03/10/1993VOTE SHEET unopposed motion to supplement the record
03/12/1993VOTE SHEET - aplt's motion for leave to file reply brief lodged reply brief
03/16/1993ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE REPLY BRIEFROTESC
03/16/1993APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF is filed
03/16/1993ORDER - Grant appellant's unopposed moiton to supplement the record on appeal with documents on file in the Superior Court but not contained in the record certified to this court, it is ORDERED on behalf of the merits division assigned to consider this appeal that the motion is granted. The Clerk of the Superior Court is directed to certify forthwith to this court as a supplemental record, the documents described in appellant's motion of March 2, 1993 WHG
03/17/1993FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/17/1993ARGUED RO TE SC Richard Greenlee, Esq. for appellant; Chrisellen R. Kolb, Esq. for appellee.
03/18/1993VOTE SHEET - proposed order for motion to supplement the record
03/19/1993SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #13 (pleading filed in superior court)
03/22/1993ORDER - grant appellant's motion to supplement the record on appeal to include a copy of grand jury transcript of Michael Minick in F-367-88 ( No. 91-CF-994), and there being no opposition thereto, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and Clerk and the transcript is made part of the record in this appeal. (ROTESC)
03/25/1993MEMORANDUM - Transmitting to the assigned judge supplemental record #13
03/29/1993SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (testimony of Michael A.Minick dtd 1/26/88)
03/31/1993AFFIRMED
04/21/1993LETTER from aplt requesting more time to file pet. for rehearing
04/27/1993ORD GRT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EB within 30 days from the date of this order. (RO)
05/28/1993APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL
06/01/1993RECEIVED - aplt's pet. for reh/reh en banc
06/03/1993VOTE SHEET aplt's pro se pet for reh/reh en banc
06/08/1993ORDER GRANTING APLT MO FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL and Brian C. Plitt, Esquire, is hereby appointed as counsel to represent appellant for the purpose of filing a petition for certiorari in the United States Supreme Court. (RO)
06/08/1993APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) Brian C. Plitt, Esq. (Petition for Writ of Certiorari)
10/08/1993ORD DENY APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC (Judges Farrell and King have recused themselves from this case.) (EB)
10/18/1993MANDATE ISSUED
11/04/1993COPY OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI filed in the Supreme Court
12/07/1993NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI in the supreme court filed 11/29/93 No. 93-6955
01/14/1994NOTICE OF DENIAL OF PET. FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI on Janaury 10, 1994