judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHEILA A. NORRIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1334
Short Caption:SHEILA A. NORRIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4286-87Filed Date:10/20/1988

Opening Event Date:10/20/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/20/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/17/1990
Argued/Submitted:05/30/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/05/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSheila A. Norris N
James W. KleinNY
Elizabeth G. Taylor YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901NORRIS, SHEILA A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/05/30 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - TAYLORE FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - CORKENC FOR - APPELLEE
10/20/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/14/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING THE TRANSCRIPT ORDERED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD R
03/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(407 PGS/HUNT)(16 PGS/RHOAD) AD PANEL SCDATE 011789 SCHPRD RT
03/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(10 PGS/GLEASON) AD PANEL SCDATE 011989 SCHPRD RT
05/02/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (280 PGS - TOOBY) JB PANEL SCDATE 070289 SCHPRD RT
07/18/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO EXT TM TO FL RT; RT DUE IN 10 DAYS. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD RT
07/20/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/20/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (205 PGS. -- SHELTON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 072889 SCHPRD RT
08/29/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/28/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 082989 SCHPRD BA
08/31/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/28/89. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 083089 SCHPRD M
09/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/30/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 092889 SCHPRD BA
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/30/89; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD M
10/30/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD BA
12/14/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 17, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD BE
12/19/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRIEF TO 1/17/90. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 121589 SCHPRD V
01/17/1990FiledBriefing Completed
01/17/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 011790 SCHPRD BE
04/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ARG ON SUM CAL OF 5/30/90. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 042390 SCHPRD OPE
04/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (APPELLANT'S) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990RECEIVED APPELLNT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL REPLY BRF & REPLY BRF IS FL. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 041690 SCHPRD VS
04/24/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1990ORDER SS ORDER CASE REDESIGNATED AS REGULAR CASE & SCHEDULED FOR ARGUMENT 5/30 AT 1:30 PM. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 051590 SCHPRD VS
05/30/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/30/1990ARGUED PANELNWTEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1991AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART JUDGMENT AF IN PART JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION/CAUSE RM w/ INSTRUCTIONS SET FORTH IN OP. PANELNWTEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRM METH -OPN JUDGE -MK CITE 585 A.2d 1372
01/31/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - MK PAGE # - 0396
02/14/1991MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION TO MODIFY OPINION AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT TO MODIFY OPINION AS STATED IN ORDER. MEH (PRINTED @ p.396-A) PANELTENWMK SCDATE 022091 SCHPRD VS
03/05/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD